(DP)(HC) Rangel v. Davis

Petitioner: Pedro Rangel
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 1:2018cv01713
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Initial Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED EVENT. (Jessen, A)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/26/2019. Added attorneys Donald Jay Ritt and Verna Jean Wefald as co-counsel for Petitioner. (Jessen, A)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Assigning Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone to this Action, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/21/18. The New Case No. is: 1:18-cv-01713-AWI-SAB. (Gonzalez, R)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Application for Appointment of Counsel #1 ; ORDER Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/21/18. (Gonzalez, R)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Pedro Rangel. (Sant Agata, S)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Pedro Rangel, CDC P-28501 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Sant Agata, S)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Death Penalty Case. (Sant Agata, S)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:18-cv-3204 TLN DB) to Fresno (1:18-cv-1713 AWI) signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/18/2018. (Henshaw, R)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): Death Penalty Case filed. (Benson, A.)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Pedro Rangel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Culshaw, Kelly)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for LEAVE to File In Forma Pauperis by Pedro Rangel. Attorney Culshaw, Kelly L. added. (Culshaw, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (DP)(HC) Rangel v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Kenneth Norman Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedro Rangel
Represented By: Kelly L. Culshaw
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Corey Mann
Represented By: Donald Jay Ritt
Represented By: Verna Jean Wefald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?