(PC) Concepcion v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Concepcion
Defendant: Ralph Diaz, California Correctional Health Care Services, Clark J. Kelso, Jeffrey Carrick and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01743
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Michelle Concepcion. (Jessen, A)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Michelle Concepcion. (Jessen, A)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Michelle Concepcion, CDC W-75777 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Jessen, A)
February 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations served on Michelle Concepcion. (Jessen, A)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Clerk to Assign a District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED, Without Prejudice, for Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Available Administrative Remedies Prior to Filing Suit re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/4/2019. This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is 1:18-cv-01743-LJO-JLT (PC). Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order to Show Cause, served on Michelle Concepcion. (Marrujo, C)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failing to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/4/19. Show Cause Response Due Within Twenty One Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michelle Concepcion. (Marrujo, C)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michelle Concepcion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Concepcion v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark J. Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Carrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?