Smithee et al v. California Correctional Institution et al
Case Number: 1:2019cv00004
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING 130 Request to Terminate Former Defendants From the Docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/8/2022. (Marrujo, C)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING 115 Motion to Amend the Fourth Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/09/2021. Three-Day Deadline.(Flores, E)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Closing the Action as to Defendant Celosse Only 116 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/7/2021. (Hall, S)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING 118 Motion to Seal Certain Portions of the Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/2021. (Hall, S)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DENYING 113 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/15/2021. (Hall, S)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re 110 Second Stipulation to Keep Discovery Open for Limited Purpose, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/7/2021. (Rivera, O)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO KEEP DISCOVERY OPEN FOR LIMITED PURPOSE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/06/2021. Good cause appearing, the parties' stipulation to keep discovery open for the limited purpose of deposing PRATAP NARAYAN, M.D. is GRANTED. Fact discovery for any other purpose closes on October 14, 2021, as scheduled. (Gonzales, V)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 105 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/25/2021. (Hall, S)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/15/2021. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 3/8/2021; Non-Expert 10/14/2021; Expert 2/1/2022. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 2/15/2022; Hearing by 3/15/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/15/2022; Hearing by 5/24/2022. Settlement Conference set for 8/1/2022 at 01:00 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4. (Hall, S)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION and ORDER 94 for Continuance of Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/11/2020. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 1/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ADOPTING 91 Findings and Recommendations to Dismiss Certain Claims and ORDER Directing Defendant Celosse to File an Answer Within Sixty (60) Days signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/16/2020. (Jessen, A)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Certain Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/20/2020. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART the 79 Findings and Recommendations GRANTING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 66 and 67 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/18/2020. ( Fifth Amended Complaint or Notice to Court due 30-Day Deadline) Jennifer Seymour, Rhonda Litt-Stoner and Pratap Narayn terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/29/2020. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and ORDER 71 to Continue the Hearing Date on Motions to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/25/2020. Motion Hearings continued to 3/31/2020 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 61 62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Fourth Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/16/2019. Fourth Amended Complaint due within 30 days. (Hall, S)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADOPTING 54 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 48 & 49 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/5/2019. Third Amended Complaint due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 48 49 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/23/2019. Referred to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. Motion hearing set for 10/24/2019 is VACATED. (Hall, S)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING in Full the 41 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING Defendants' 29 32 Motions to Dismiss; ORDER Deeming the 45 Third Amended Complaint Filed August 29, 2019 as the Operative Pleading signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/6/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/15/2019. Referred to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 35 Request for Additional Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint and DENYING 33 Request to Enter Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/31/2019. (Hall, S)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Stipulation to Extend Time To Respond To Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 06/05/2019. (Hall, S)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER 24 GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION to Allow the Filing of a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/23/2019. (Hall, S)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING AS UNRIPE 21 Stipulation to File a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/10/2019. (Hall, S)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation to Continue the Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/29/2019. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 7/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER to Allow Filing of First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/23/2019. The hearing on the motion to dismiss 12 is VACATED. (Hall, S)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 13 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and to Continue Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/5/2019. Hearing on motion to dismiss CONTINUED to 5/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 5/23/2019 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Reclassifying the Case as a Prisoner Action signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/28/2019. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING 7 the Petition to Appoint Jennifer Montes as Guardian ad Litem for Minor Plaintiff E.M., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/7/2019. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smithee et al v. California Correctional Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?