(PC) Taylor v. Jiminez et al

Plaintiff: Shauntae Taylor
Defendant: R. Rodriguez, M. Jiminez, J. Hernandez, C. Huckleberry and P. Rye
Case Number: 1:2019cv00068
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Shauntae Taylor. (Hellings, J)
January 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Shauntae Taylor. (Hellings, J)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP #5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Shauntae Taylor. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT to Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint #1 , by Shauntae Taylor. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on COR.filings@cdcr.ca.gov. (Gonzalez, R)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *1/16/2019*; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Gonzalez, R)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Hernandez, C. Huckleberry, M. Jiminez, R. Rodriguez, P. Rye by Shauntae Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Taylor v. Jiminez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jiminez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Huckleberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauntae Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?