(PC)Jackio v. Lameer et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence L. Jackio
Defendant: M. Z. Lameer, I. Patel and C. Clark
Case Number: 1:2019cv00080
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, served on Lawrence L. Jackio. (Gonzalez, R)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *C. Clark, M. Z. Lameer* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lawrence L. Jackio AB-2494* *KERN VALLEY STATE PRISON* *P.O. BOX 5102* *DELANO, CA 93216*. (Gonzalez, R)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant(s): *M. Z. Lameer*, *C. Clark*,. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this Order served via email on CDCR. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Gonzalez, R)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against M. Z. Lameer, I. Patel by Lawrence L. Jackio.(Martin-Gill, S)
February 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Lawrence L. Jackio. (Sant Agata, S)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00080-AWI-SAB(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Lawrence L. Jackio. (Sant Agata, S)
February 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Screening Order served on Lawrence L. Jackio. (Sant Agata, S)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; Amended Complaint due within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
January 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Lawrence L. Jackio. (Flores, E)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lawrence L. Jackio. (Flores, E)
January 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Lawrence L. Jackio. (Gonzalez, R)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay the Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/18/19. Motion for IFP Due Within 45-Days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application & Instructions)(Gonzalez, R)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on Kern Valley State Prison. (Sant Agata, S)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *1/17/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Sant Agata, S)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lawrence L. Jackio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Jackio v. Lameer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Z. Lameer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence L. Jackio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?