(PC) Howell v. Davidson et al
Plaintiff: Kareem J. Howell
Defendant: W. Kraay, D. Childress, L. Hense, J. Burns, M. Gamboa, J. Davidson and A. Randolph
Case Number: 1:2019cv00094
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order, served on Kareem J. Howell. (Gonzalez, R)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Closing the Case with Prejudice Due to Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal #11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/4/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Kareem J. Howell. (Marrujo, C)
March 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order, served on Kareem J. Howell. (Marrujo, C)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Following Settlement; VACATING Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/28/19. (Marrujo, C)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 2/28/2019; CASE SETTLED and terms placed on the record. The Court vacates all pending dates. Dispositive documents to be submitted within 30 days. Plaintiff Kareem J. Howell (Pro Se) present. Defendants Counsel Sarah Brattin and N Cahill present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Hernandez, M)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kareem J. Howell. (Marrujo, C)
January 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Kareem J. Howell. (Jessen, A)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Kareem J. Howell. (Jessen, A)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Kareem J. Howell, CDC P-79828 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Jessen, A)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcoran State Prison. (Jessen, A)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *1/22/2019*; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Jessen, A)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kareem J. Howell. (Jessen, A)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Burns, D. Childress, J. Davidson, M. Gamboa, L. Hense, W. Kraay, A. Randolph by Kareem J. Howell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Howell v. Davidson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Kraay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Hense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem J. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?