(SS) Valerie Ann Patterson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Valerie Ann Patterson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00174
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Marriott, Michael K. added. (Marriott, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Valerie Ann Patterson. (Holmberg, Matthew)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Valerie Ann Patterson. Attorney Holmberg, Matthew Franklin added. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holmberg, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Social Security Instructions) (Marrujo, C)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Lawrence David Rohlfing* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 East Imperial Highway, Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Marrujo, C)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/11/19. (Marrujo, C)
February 8, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required.(Text only) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Valerie Ann Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review of The Final Decision Of The Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security by Valerie Ann Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Interested Parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rohlfing, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Valerie Ann Patterson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Ann Patterson
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Represented By: Matthew Franklin Holmberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?