(PC) Black v. Hanzak et al
Plaintiff: Bobby L. Black
Defendant: J. Hanzak, D. Goss, J. Escutia and J. Willis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00238
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Bobby L. Black. (Sant Agata, S)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Sant Agata, S)
February 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Bobby L. Black. (Plummer, M)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Plummer, M)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:19-cv-0285 CKD P) to Fresno (1:19-cv-0238 SAB P) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/20/19. (Plummer, M)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Bobby L. Black. (York, M)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Bobby L. Black, CDC AH-1704 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
February 14, 2019 SERVICE BY E-MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Bobby L. Black. (Huang, H)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *2/14/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 3/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Huang, H)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Bobby L. Black. (Huang, H)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Escutia, D. Goss, J. Hanzak, J. Willis by Bobby L. Black. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Black v. Hanzak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby L. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hanzak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Escutia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?