(PC) Anderson v. Kernan et al
Plaintiff: Hector Clarence Anderson
Defendant: H. Anglea and Kernan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00255
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File IFP Application by Hector Clarence Anderson. (Sant Agata, S)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Hector Clarence Anderson. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Hector Clarence Anderson. (Gonzalez, R)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within Forty-Five Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application & Instructions)(Gonzalez, R)
February 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Hector Clarence Anderson. (Sant Agata, S)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against H. Anglea, Kernan by Hector Clarence Anderson.(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Anderson v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Anglea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Clarence Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?