Van Bebber v. Dignity Health et al
Plaintiff: Robert Van Bebber
Defendant: Dignity Health and Dignity Health a California Corporation Doing business as Mercy Medical Center - Merced
Case Number: 1:2019cv00264
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Natasha L. Domek on behalf of Dignity Health. Attorney Domek, Natasha L. added. (Domek, Natasha)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Daniel J. McQueen for Dignity Health, attorney Tracey Adano Kennedy terminated (McQueen, Daniel)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) As a Motion to Remand, document #9 , has been noticed for hearing on 5/21/2019 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/14/2019 is CONTINUED and will now be held on 7/29/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The Court grants telephonic appearances, with each party wishing to so appear directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. The parties are also reminded to file a joint scheduling report one full week prior to the conference and email a copy of same, in Word format, to epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov, for the Judge's review. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/25/2019. (Rooney, M)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to REMAND Sanctions in the Amount of $6,500.00 by Robert Van Bebber. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Janelle Carney, #3 Proposed Order)(Carney, Janelle)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Limore Torbati on behalf of Dignity Health. Attorney Torbati, Limore added. (Torbati, Limore)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Robert Van Bebber. (Carney, Janelle)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Dignity Health re #5 Notice of Noncompliance with Electronic Filing Requirement, #4 Civil New Case Documents for DAD. (Kennedy, Tracey)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE Directing Attorney Janelle Carney to Complete the Petition by Attorney for Admission to the Eastern District of California. (Flores, E)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Notice of Noncompliance with Electronic Filing Requirement, #4 Civil New Case Documents for DAD served on Janelle Carney NCAED. (Flores, E)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Dignity Health re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,. (Kennedy, Tracey)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Dignity Health re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,. (Kennedy, Tracey)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Merced Superior Court, case number 17-cv-02311 by Robert Van Bebber. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8125195) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3) Complaint, #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3) Complaint, #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3) Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint and Summons, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Posting Jury, #6 Exhibit D - Notice of Association of Counsel, #7 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing of POS of Summons, #8 Exhibit F - Answer to First Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit G - Notice of Related Case, #10 Exhibit H (Part 1 of 2) - Plaintiff's Opposition to Notice of Related Case, #11 Exhibit H (Part 2 of 2) - Plaintiff's Opposition to Notice of Related Case, #12 Exhibit I - Joint CMC Statement, #13 Exhibit J - CMC Findings and Order 12-18, #14 Exhibit K - Stipulation re Neutral Mailer, #15 Exhibit L - Notice of Entry of Order re Neutral Mailer, #16 Exhibit M - Joint Statement re Status Conference 3-26-18, #17 Exhibit N - CMC Findings and Order 4-9, #18 Exhibit O - Declaration of Mailing from Administrator, #19 Exhibit P - Joint Statement re Status Conference 7-30-18, #20 Exhibit CMC Findings and Order 8-13, #21 Exhibit R - Stipulation for Protective Order, #22 Exhibit S - Notice of Related Case 10-10-18, #23 Exhibit Joint Statement Re Status Conference 11-28-18, #24 Exhibit U - CMC Findings and Order 12-10, #25 Exhibit V - Notice of Related Case 1-10-19, #26 Exhibit W - Joint Stipulation to Allow Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint, #27 Exhibit X - Order Allowing Plaintiff to File SAC, #28 Exhibit Y - Notice of Entry of Order Allowing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint, #29 Exhibit Z - Second Amended Complaint, #30 Exhibit AA - Order Assigning Judge McCabe, #31 Exhibit BB - Answer to Second Amended Complaint, #32 Defendant's Notice of Interested Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, #33 Defendant's Corporate Disclsoure Statement, #34 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Tracey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Bebber v. Dignity Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Van Bebber
Represented By: Janelle Carney, NCAED
Represented By: Janelle Christine Carney
Represented By: Giuseppe Joseph Antonelli
Represented By: Robert Starr
Represented By: Adam Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Represented By: Richard J. Simmons
Represented By: Tracey Adano Kennedy
Represented By: Natasha L. Domek
Represented By: Limore Torbati
Represented By: Daniel J. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health a California Corporation Doing business as Mercy Medical Center - Merced
Represented By: Richard J. Simmons
Represented By: Tracey Adano Kennedy
Represented By: Natasha L. Domek
Represented By: Limore Torbati
Represented By: Daniel J. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?