(SS) Hayer v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Sukhvinder Singh Hayer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00297
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Lahey, Sharon added. (Lahey, Sharon)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sukhvinder Singh Hayer. (Haley, Denise)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Sukhvinder Singh Hayer. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/21/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haley, Denise)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Fresno SS Scheduling Order, #2 SS Consent Form, #3 USM Social Security Instructions Packet) (Hellings, J)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Denise Bourgeois Haley* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 East Imperial Highway, Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Hellings, J)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP #2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/6/2019. (Hellings, J)
March 5, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Hellings, J)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sukhvinder Singh Hayer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haley, Denise)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review of The Final Decision Of The Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security by Sukhvinder Singh Hayer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification of Interested Parties)(Haley, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Hayer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sharon Lahey, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukhvinder Singh Hayer
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?