Deborah Rule v. Tempoe, LLC
Plaintiff: Deborah Rule
Defendant: Tempoe, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00368
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Class Action Scheduling Conference Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/2019. (Discovery due by 3/16/2020; Expert Disclosure due by 4/17/2020; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 5/15/2020; Expert Discovery due by 6/19/2020; Motion for Class Certification filed by 7/17/2020; Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Rosales, O.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Tempoe, LLC.(Waste, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/9/2019 with an order to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel Avi Kaufman telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel John Waste personally present and Stephen Barham, Amy Doolittle, and Emily Wallerstein telephonically present. (Rooney, M)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/8/19. Added attorney Amy Brown Doolittle, PHV for Tempoe, LLC, (Martin-Gill, S)
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Tempoe, LLC for attorney Amy Brown Doolittle to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wallerstein, Emily)
July 5, 2019 PAYMENT for Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number 0972-8344171. (Wallerstein, Emily)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Eric J. Troutman on behalf of Tempoe, LLC. Attorney Troutman, Eric J. added. (Troutman, Eric)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Emily L. Wallerstein on behalf of Tempoe, LLC. Attorney Wallerstein, Emily L. added. (Wallerstein, Emily)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Deborah Rule. Attorney Kaufman, Rachel Elizabeth added. (Kaufman, Rachel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Tempoe, LLC. (Waste, John)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tempoe, LLC. (Waste, John)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Tempoe, LLC.(Waste, John)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/5/19. Added attorney Stephen David Barham, PHV for Tempoe, LLC (Martin-Gill, S)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Tempoe, LLC for attorney Stephen David Barham to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8296197) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record)(Waste, John)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER granting the parties' stipulation as follows: 1) Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended to Thursday, June 20, 2019. Defendant may, on or before that date, respond to the complaint in any fashion that would have been permitted through and including May 20, 2019, in the absence of this stipulation; 2) The pre-stipulation deadline for the Rule 26 conference is June 19, 2019. This shall be moved up to June 4, 2019; and 3) The parties have until June 28, 2019, to provide their initial disclosures. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/20/2019. (Rooney, M)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Answer to Complaint and Matters Subject to FRCP 26 by Tempoe, LLC. Attorney Waste, John J. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Waste, John)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Tempoe, LLC served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Kaufman, Rachel)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER Added attorney Avi R. Kaufman, PHV for Deborah Rule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/8/2019. (Hellings, J)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Deborah Rule for attorney Avi R. Kaufman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8198232) (Benedict, Amanda)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Benedict, Amanda)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 EPG Sch Conf, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Tempoe, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Fay Benedict* *Law Office of Amanda Benedict* *7710 Hazard Center Dr., Suite E104* *San Diego, CA 92108*. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Deborah Rule. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8167174) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benedict, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deborah Rule v. Tempoe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Rule
Represented By: Amanda Fay Benedict
Represented By: Avi R. Kaufman, PHV
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempoe, LLC
Represented By: John J. Waste
Represented By: Stephen David Barham, PHV
Represented By: Amy Brown Doolittle, PHV
Represented By: Eric J. Troutman
Represented By: Emily L. Wallerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?