(HC) Holguin v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Felipe Roman Holguin
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 1:2019cv00380
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations,, Findings and Recommendations (Order), #12 Judgment served on Felipe Roman Holguin. (Flores, E)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT dated *06/13/2019* pursuant to order. (Flores, E)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING #10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment and Close Case signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/12/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 30, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Felipe Roman Holguin. (Gonzalez, R)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Summarily Dismiss Unexhausted Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/30/19. This case is assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The New Case No. is: 1:19-cv-0380-LJO-SKO. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Felipe Roman Holguin. (Jessen, A)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Felipe Roman Holguin. (Jessen, A)
April 2, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, #7 Order Dismissing Petition with Leave to Amend served on Felipe Roman Holguin. (Hellings, J)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus WITH LEAVE TO AMEND #1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/1/2019: 30-Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition - blank form)(Hellings, J)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/1/2019. (Hellings, J)
March 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Felipe Roman Holguin. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Felipe Roman Holguin signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/22/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Felipe Roman Holguin. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Felipe Roman Holguin. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Felipe Roman Holguin.(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Holguin v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Felipe Roman Holguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?