(PC) Patrick M. McMillan v. Delgado et al
Plaintiff: Patrick M. McMillan
Defendant: N. Romero, D. Brown, J. Dunnahoe, C. Riley, B. Jones, O. Delgado and M. Negrete
Case Number: 1:2019cv00444
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 70 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/3/19. Settlement Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Marrujo, C)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order, served on Patrick M. McMillan. (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER TO PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by D. Brown, O. Delgado, J. Dunnahoe, B. Jones, M. Negrete, C. Riley, N. Romero. (Goodwin, David)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING June 6, 2019 Order #11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/19. (Marrujo, C)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *D. Brown, O. Delgado, J. Dunnahoe, B. Jones, M. Negrete, C. Riley, N. Romero* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patrick M. McMillan, P16483* *SALINAS VALLEY STATE PRISON* *P.O. BOX 1020* *SOLEDAD, CA 93960*. (Marrujo, C)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant(s): *O. Delgado*, *N. Romero*,*D. Brown*,*C. Riley*, *B. Jones*, *M. Negrete*,*J. Dunnahoe*, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/4/19.. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this Order served via email on CDCR. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Marrujo, C)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, served on Patrick M. McMillan. (Marrujo, C)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING #8 Findings and Recommendations, and Dismissing the Failure to Protect Claim, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/3/19. (Marrujo, C)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Patrick M. McMillan. (Marrujo, C)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADDENDUM to #8 Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/6/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order served on Patrick M. McMillan. (Sant Agata, S)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal for Failure to Protect Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/6/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due in Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Patrick M. McMillan. (Sant Agata, S)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to Inform the Court that Plaintiff does not Intend to Amend and is Willing to Proceed on his Claim Against Defendants Delgado, Romero, Brown, Jones, Negrete, Dunnahoe, and Riley for Excessive Force by Patrick M. McMillan. (Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Patrick M. McMillan. (Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00444-LJO-SAB(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Patrick M. McMillan. (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by D. Brown, O. Delgado, J. Dunnahoe, B. Jones, M. Negrete, C. Riley, N. Romero. (Goodwin, David)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint OR Notify the Court of Intent to Proceed on Claim Found to be Cognizable, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/12/19. Thirty Day Deadline. (Attachment: #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Marrujo, C).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Patrick M. McMillan. (Marrujo, C)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-18-102891 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8197939) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodwin, David)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Complaint (pg 1-3 only), #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Patrick M. McMillan. (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Patrick M. McMillan v. Delgado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Romero
Represented By: David C. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Brown
Represented By: David C. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dunnahoe
Represented By: David C. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Riley
Represented By: David C. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Jones
Represented By: David C. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Delgado
Represented By: David C. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Negrete
Represented By: David C. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?