Doe v. Kane, et al.

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Thomas R. Kane, Boudreau, Mary Mitchell, Deborah G. Schult, Devin Blocher and Andre Matevousian
Case Number: 1:2019cv00467
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #12 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/08/2019. Good cause appearing, and in the interests of judicial and party economy, Plaintiff's request to continue the Mandatory Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. The Mandatory Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to August 13, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzales, V)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to CONTINUE Mandatory Scheduling Conference by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wallach, Ian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John Doe for attorney EJ Hurst, II to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8340873) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S.D.C. E.D.N.C. Certificate of Good Standing)(Wallach, Ian)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Ian Wallach re #9 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s): Your filing is entitled Notice of Request to Seal, however, the actual document attached is a Motion to Seal. Please re-file your document using the correct Motion event. Additionally, you must email the proposed order in word processing format to the Magistrate Judge (Local Rule 137 b). For future filings, do not use the generic Notice (other) event when a more specific event is available. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Gonzalez, R)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice Of Motion To File Under Seal)(Wallach, Ian)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re Pseudonymous Filing re #2 MOTION Anonymous Filing re #1 Complaint by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order To File Pseudonymously)(Wallach, Ian)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference currently set for Thursday, July 11, 2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/16/2019. (Valdez, E)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Ian Wallach re #5 Notice - Other: Your document was incorrectly filed as a Notice. The document should be filed with the event Proposed Order. Additionally, Local Rule 137(b) requires that you email the proposed order in word processing format to the appropriate Judge. Please e-mail a word-processed copy of your document to Judge McAullife at bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Gonzalez, R)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROPOSED ORDER RE: PSEUDONYM by John Doe re #2 MOTION Anonymous Filing re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Proceed Pseudonymously)(Wallach, Ian)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Devin Blocher, Boudreau, Thomas R. Kane, Andre Matevousian, Mary Mitchell, Deborah G. Schult* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Ian Michael Wallach* *The Law Offices of Ian Wallach, PC* *11400 W Olympic Blvd., Suite 1500* *Los Angeles, CA 90064*. (Lundstrom, T)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED under a Pseudonym by John Doe re #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Wallach, Ian)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Doe. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8205621) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wallach, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Kane, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boudreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah G. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Blocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Matevousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?