(PC) Steele v. CDCR, et al.

Plaintiff: Justin Steele
Defendant: John Sutton, F Sackett, R. Calderon, A. Sandoval, Lt. E Venegas, CDCR, R. Samarripas, J Carillo, A Hermosillo and J. Delgadillo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00471
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Justin Steele. (Jessen, A)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00471-AWI-JLT (PC). (Jessen, A)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Justin Steele. (Jessen, A)
May 28, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Second Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Justin Steele. (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/28/2019. Consent or Decline due by 7/1/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
April 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Justin Steele. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/22/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Justin Steele. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP APPLICATION) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Justin Steele (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Filings.WSP@cdcr.ca.gov for Plaintiff, Justin Steele. (Lundstrom, T)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Justin Steele, CDC F-26987 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Lundstrom, T)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/11/2019*. Consent or Decline due by 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Lundstrom, T)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Justin Steele. (Lundstrom, T)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Justin Steele. (Lundstrom, T)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against CDCR, R. Calderon, J Carillo, J. Delgadillo, A Hermosillo, F Sackett, R. Samarripas, A. Sandoval, John Sutton and E Venegas by Justin Steele. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Steele v. CDCR, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. E Venegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Samarripas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Carillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Hermosillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Delgadillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?