United States of America v. LaForce et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board, Patricia Jean LaForce and County of Stanislaus
Case Number: 1:2019cv00479
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/1/2019. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing the Scheduling Conference currently set for July 11, 2019, is HEREBY CONTINUED to September 25, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A Joint Scheduling Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel and which meets the requirements set forth in the Courts Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (Doc. No. #4 ), shall be filed one (1) full week prior to the conference. The parties may appear at the conference by telephone with each party using the following dial-in number and access code: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; access code 3190866. If the parties file a notice of settlement prior to the conference, then the conference will be vacated. However, if the parties are unable to reach a settlement, then the conference will proceed. (Valdez, E)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference re #4 Civil New Case Documents for LJO by United States of America. (Hauck, Jonathan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER by State of California Franchise Tax Board. Attorney Rust, Craig Damon added.(Rust, Craig)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER by County of Stanislaus. Attorney Solish, Daniel Perry added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Solish, Daniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: State of California Franchise Tax Board served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hauck, Jonathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Stanislaus served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Hauck, Jonathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Patricia Jean LaForce served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Hauck, Jonathan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America.(Hauck, Jonathan)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference currently set for Thursday, July 11, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/16/2019. (Valdez, E)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Stanislaus, Patricia Jean LaForce, State of California Franchise Tax Board* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan Hauck* *U.S. Department Of Justice, Tax Division* *P.O. Box 683* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Marrujo, C)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Hauck, Jonathan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Attorney Hauck, Jonathan added. (Hauck, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. LaForce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board
Represented By: Craig Damon Rust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Jean LaForce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Represented By: Daniel Perry Solish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan Hauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?