County of Kern et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Kern, The People of the State of California, People of the State of California and California Attorney General's Office
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Insys Therapeutics, Inc, McKesson Corporation, Jonathan D Sackler, The Purdue Frederick Company, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Actavis PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Irene Sackler Lefcourt, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Kathe A Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, David A Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Richard S Sackler, Cephalon, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan, Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Actavis,PLC and Actavis, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00557
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Rebecca G. Van Tassell by McKesson Corporation. Attorney Van Tassell, Rebecca Grace added. (Van Tassell, Rebecca)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support of (1) Kern County's Motion to Remand and (2) Kern County's Opposition to Distributor Defendants' Motion to Stay by County of Kern, People of the State of California re #12 Opposition to Motion, #8 MOTION to REMAND ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. (Messenger, Lucas)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court is in receipt of Defendants' Notice for Leave to File Supplemental Authority #19 , filed in conjunction with their Motion to Stay #10 . The Court GRANTS Defendants' request and will consider the authority as appropriate when ruling signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 14, 2019. (Munoz, I)
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Defendant Insys Therapeutics, Inc. by Insys Therapeutics, Inc (Wang, Stacey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DISTRIBUTOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY by McKesson Corporation re #10 MOTION to STAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shafroth, Nathan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of RELATED CASE by California Attorney General's Office. Attorney Burkart, Michiyo Michelle added. (Burkart, Michiyo)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #5 Stipulation to Extend Time for the Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/6/2019. (Hall, S)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY by McKesson Corporation re #10 MOTION to STAY. (Shafroth, Nathan)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has received and reviewed the papers filed thus far in connection with the motion to remand #8 and motion to stay #10 , and concludes that it will be important to have both motions fully briefed before acting on either. In addition, at this time, the Court believes the matters are presented with clarity in the briefs and that no hearing will be needed. Accordingly, the hearings on both motions, currently set for June 5 and June 10, 2019, respectively, are VACATED. This does not change the reply deadline re: the motion to stay. Once that deadline expires, the Court will endeavor to rule as quickly as possible in light of its heavy caseload signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 31, 2019. (Munoz, I)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Alison Burrowes in opposition to #10 MOTION to STAY. (Messenger, Lucas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY by County of Kern, People of the State of California to RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to REMAND ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice, Exs. F-I)(Messenger, Lucas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 OPPOSITION by County of Kern, People of the State of California to #10 MOTION to STAY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lucas A. Messenger, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibits A-P to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibits Q-Y to Request Judicial Notice)(Messenger, Lucas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by McKesson Corporation to #8 MOTION to REMAND ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Shafroth, Nathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to STAY by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Shafroth, Nathan)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #7 Stipulation to Extend Time for the Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings and Continuing the Mandatory Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/8/2019. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 10/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to REMAND ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by County of Kern, The People of the State of California. Attorney Messenger, Lucas A. added. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Messenger, Lucas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc, Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC F/K/A ACTAVIS, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attorney Neglia, Ashley added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Joint Stipulation to Extend)(Neglia, Ashley)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ashley Neglia on behalf of Allergan USA, Inc.. Attorney Neglia, Ashley added. (Neglia, Ashley)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (Shafroth, Nathan)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-19-100861 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8235963) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Shafroth, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Kern et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Nathan Shafroth
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Van Tassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Ashley Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc
Represented By: Ashley Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis,PLC
Represented By: Ashley Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Kern
Represented By: Michael Aaron Geibelson
Represented By: Margo A. Raison
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Represented By: Lucas A. Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of California
Represented By: Michael Aaron Geibelson
Represented By: Margo A. Raison
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Represented By: Michael Aaron Geibelson
Represented By: Margo A. Raison
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Represented By: Lucas A. Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Attorney General's Office
Represented By: Michiyo Michelle Burkart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?