Cruz v. Ty Kharazi et al
Plaintiff: Frank Cruz
Defendant: J. Puente, Yarra Law Group, H. Ty Kharazi, Margaret Mims, County of Fresno, State of California and Mel Abdelaziz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00590
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to STRIKE by H. Ty Kharazi, Yarra Law Group. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP), #2 Declaration of H. Ty Kharazi in Support of Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP))(Davidson, Thornton)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS by H. Ty Kharazi, Yarra Law Group. Attorney Davidson, Thornton added. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (FRCP 12(b)(6)))(Davidson, Thornton)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by Mel Abdelaziz. Attorney Kharazi, Hadi Ty added. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mel Abdelaziz in Support of Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 425.16, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (FRCP 12(b)(6)) and Motion to Strike CCP, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Special Motion to Strike)(Kharazi, Hadi)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mel Abdelaziz, County of Fresno, State of California, Margaret Mims, J. Puente, H. Ty Kharazi, Yarra Law Group* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Frank Cruz* *1708 N. Cedar Ave* *Fresno, CA 93703*. (Flores, E)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed IFP as Moot and Directing Office of the Clerk to Issue Summons and New Case Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/10/2019. (Flores, E)
June 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #9 Civil New Case Documents for LJO, #8 Summons served on Frank Cruz. (Flores, E)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by H. Ty Kharazi. Attorney Kharazi, Hadi Ty added. (Kharazi, Hadi)
June 7, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE100042712 $400.00 fbo Frank Cruz by Frank Cruz on 6/7/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Frank Cruz. (Sant Agata, S)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Frank Cruz.(Sant Agata, S)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Submit Long Form Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/19/2019. Twenty-Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Application for IFP Long Form)(Flores, E)
May 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Frank Cruz. (Flores, E)
May 8, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Frank Cruz. (Marrujo, C)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Frank Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Ty Kharazi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Puente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarra Law Group
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ty Kharazi
Represented By: Hadi Ty Kharazi
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno, State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Abdelaziz
Represented By: Hadi Ty Kharazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?