Varela v. State Farm General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ashlee Varela
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00617
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by State Farm General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Answer to Complaint)(Denno, Dana)
June 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Stipulation and Order, served on Dylan L. Schaffer. (Rosales, O.)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order extending time for Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company to respond to complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/4/2019. (Response due by 6/17/2019) (Rosales, O.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by State Farm General Insurance Company. Attorney Denno, Dana added. (Denno, Dana)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: State Farm General Insurance Company served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Kerley, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ashlee Varela. (Kerley, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 EPG Sched Conf, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Hellings, J)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *State Farm General Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Edward Kerley, Jr.* *Kerley Schaffer, LLP* *1939 Harrison Street, Suite 500* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Hellings, J)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm General Insurance Company by Ashlee Varela. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8249447) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kerley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varela v. State Farm General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Dana Denno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee Varela
Represented By: John Edward Kerley, Jr.
Represented By: Dylan L. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?