(PC) Blueford v. McConnly
Plaintiff: Javar Lester Blueford
Defendant: Dr. McConnly
Case Number: 1:2019cv00618
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Javar Lester Blueford. (Sant Agata, S)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/24/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on Javar Lester Blueford. (Marrujo, C)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/10/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner)(Marrujo, C)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcorn State Prison at COR.filings@cdcr.ca.gov. (Hellings, J)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/8/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Hellings, J)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Javar Lester Blueford. (Hellings, J)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against McConnly by Javar Lester Blueford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Blueford v. McConnly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javar Lester Blueford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. McConnly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?