(PC) Huffman v. Batra et al
Plaintiff: William Ray Huffman
Defendant: Sanjeev Batra, Jonthan Hamerick and Robert Withrow
Case Number: 1:2019cv00655
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on William Ray Huffman. (Sant Agata, S)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Non-Prisoner #6 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP as a Prisoner as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/29/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by William Ray Huffman. (Sant Agata, S)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by William Ray Huffman. (Sant Agata, S)
May 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on William Ray Huffman. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit a Non-Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay the $400.00 Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/19. Motion for IFP Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Gonzalez, R)
May 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on William Ray Huffman. (Gonzalez, R)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Gonzalez, R)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by William Ray Huffman. (Gonzalez, R)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Sanjeev Batra, Jonthan Hamerick, Robert Withrow by William Ray Huffman.(Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Huffman v. Batra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjeev Batra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonthan Hamerick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Withrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ray Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?