(HC) Miguel Angel Villegas v. L.W. Sullivan
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Villegas
Defendant: J. W. Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00668
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Justain Paul Riley for J. W. Sullivan, attorney Jennifer Mary Poe terminated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Riley, Justain)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by J. W. Sullivan. Attorney Poe, Jennifer Mary added. (Poe, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 14 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Miguel Angel Villegas. (Flores, E)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Terminating #11 Motion to Proceed IFP; Previously Granted by Order #11 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 06/14/2019. (Flores, E)
June 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Miguel Angel Villegas. (Flores, E)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-668 LJO-JDP. (Flores, E)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Miguel Angel Villegas. (Flores, E)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Miguel Angel Villegas. (Jessen, A)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition, served on Miguel Angel Villegas. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT for Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/20/19. Consent or Decline due by 6/24/2019 (Martin-Gill, S)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/20/19. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Consent or Decline due by 7/22/2019(Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Miguel Angel Villegas. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Miguel Angel Villegas, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/16/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-03999.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sbou) [Transferred from cacd on 5/16/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 5/16/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Miguel Angel Villegas. The Petitioner does not consent. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 5/16/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Miguel Angel Villegas. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Miguel Angel Villegas v. L.W. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. W. Sullivan
Represented By: Jennifer Mary Poe
Represented By: Justain Paul Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?