Valerie Cashon v. Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Modesto, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Cashon
Defendant: Encompass Health Corporation and Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Modesto, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00671
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Encompass Health Corporation, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Modesto, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Notice to Adverse Party and Clerk of the California Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court)(Katz, Jennifer)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Encompass Health Corporation, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Modesto, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Declaration. (Katz, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Encompass Health Corporation, Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Modesto, LLC. (Katz, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Tina Reed re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Katz, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of John Williams re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Katz, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus Superior Court, case number CV-19-00618 by Valerie Cashon. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8263933) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Katz, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valerie Cashon v. Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Modesto, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Health Corporation
Represented By: Paul M. Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Lindsay Katz
Represented By: Christopher W. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Health Rehabilitation Hospital of Modesto, LLC
Represented By: Paul M. Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Lindsay Katz
Represented By: Christopher W. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Cashon
Represented By: Nicholas John Scardigli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?