(PC)Carroll v. Williams

Plaintiff: Arvie B. Carroll
Defendant: A. Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv00674
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Arvie B. Carroll. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Proceed IFP ; ORDER DIRECTING Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/17/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP APPLICATION) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Arvie B. Carroll. (Marrujo, C)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Arvie B. Carroll. (Marrujo, C)
May 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on Arvie B. Carroll. (Marrujo, C)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/20/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner)(Marrujo, C)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on C.S.A.T.F.. (Sant Agata, S)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/16/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Sant Agata, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Arvie B. Carroll. (Sant Agata, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against A. Williams by Arvie B. Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Carroll v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arvie B. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?