(PC) Dosio v. Odeluga et al
Plaintiff: Elmer Dosio
Defendant: S. Kernan, N. Odeluga, A. Shitiu, T. Kubicki and E. Frandez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00675
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Elmer Dosio. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP) (Flores, E)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Elmer Dosio. (Flores, E)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Elmer Dosio, CDC V-75308 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on North Kern State Prison. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/16/2019*; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Gonzalez, R)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Elmer Dosio. (Gonzalez, R)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against E. Frandez, S. Kernan, T. Kubicki, N. Odeluga, A. Shitiu by Elmer Dosio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Dosio v. Odeluga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Dosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Odeluga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Shitiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Kubicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Frandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?