Immobiliare, LLC v. Westcor Land Title Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Immobiliare, LLC
Defendant: Westcor Land Title Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: Corporate America Lending, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00680
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company re #9 Summons, #8 Counterclaim,. (Jain, Anita)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Immobiliare, LLC.(Littlewood, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Corporate America Lending, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anita Jain* *444 S. Flower Street* *Suite 1850* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Sant Agata, S)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM for (1) Fraudulent Concealment; (2) Breach of Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing; (3) Declaratory Relief; and (4) Rescission and Demand for Jury Trial against Immobiliare, LLC, Corporate America Lending, Inc. by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company.(Jain, Anita)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company.(Jain, Anita)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Thursday, August 15, 2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/24/2019. (Valdez, E)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION (JOINT) TO EXTEND DEFENDANT WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Jain, Anita)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company re #2 Civil New Case Documents for LJO. (Davitt, Vincent)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Davitt, Vincent)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Fresno, Central Division, case number 19C3CG01263 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8267782) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davitt, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immobiliare, LLC v. Westcor Land Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westcor Land Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Anita Jain
Represented By: Vincent J. Davitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immobiliare, LLC
Represented By: Steven D. McGee
Represented By: William H. Littlewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Corporate America Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?