Project Sentinel v. Komar et al
Plaintiff: Project Sentinel
Defendant: Jeanette Komar, Meyer Komar and Sarah Komar
Case Number: 1:2019cv00708
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sarah Komar served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Cristol-Deman, Liza)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jeanette Komar served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Cristol-Deman, Liza)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Meyer Komar served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Cristol-Deman, Liza)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 EPG Sch Conf, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jeanette Komar, Meyer Komar, Sarah Komar* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Liza Cristol-Deman* *Brancart & Brancart* *Post Office Box 686* *Pescadero, CA 94060*. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Monetary, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants by Project Sentinel, Inc.. Attorney Cristol-Deman, Liza added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8270531) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cristol-Deman, Liza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Project Sentinel v. Komar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Komar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyer Komar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Komar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Sentinel
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?