(PC) Sharpe v. Sherman, et al.
Plaintiff: Adam Sharpe
Defendant: Stu Sherman, S Smith, D. Rhoads, J. Lewis, D. Sanchez, C. Ramos, Ugwaeze, A Adney, S. Gates and C. Cryer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00711
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Adam Sharpe. (Jessen, A)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Adam Sharpe. (Jessen, A)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Adam Sharpe. (Lundstrom, T)
May 30, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Adam Sharpe. (Lundstrom, T)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed IFP without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/29/2019. Plaintiff to file proper IFP Application within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Adam Sharpe. (Lundstrom, T)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on SATF.Filings@cdcr.ca.gov. for Adam Sharpe. (Lundstrom, T)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Adam Sharpe, CDC V-04507 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Lundstrom, T)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/21/2019*. Consent or Decline due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Lundstrom, T)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Adam Sharpe. (Lundstrom, T)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against A Adney, C. Cryer, S. Gates, J. Lewis, C. Ramos, D. Rhoads, D. Sanchez, Stu Sherman, S Smith, Ugwaeze by Adam Sharpe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Sharpe v. Sherman, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ugwaeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Adney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?