(PC) Price v. Sutton et al
Plaintiff: Karim Hasan Price
Defendant: Carmona, John Sutton, H. Reyes, I. Miller, Rosales and Andrade
Case Number: 1:2019cv00717
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Karim Hasan Price. (Flores, E)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Application for IFP) (Flores, E)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Karim Hasan Price. (Flores, E)
June 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Karim Hasan Price. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. The new case number is: 1:19-00717 DAD-GSA (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Karim Hasan Price. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 30, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Karim Hasan Price. (Jessen, A)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SUBMIT New, Completed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
May 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Karim Hasan Price. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Karim Hasan Price. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Andrade, Carmona, I. Miller, H. Reyes, Rosales, John Sutton by Karim Hasan Price.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Price v. Sutton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karim Hasan Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?