Sanchez v. Advanced Industrial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gregorio Sanchez
Defendant: Advanced Industrial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00718
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS; ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 10, 2019. (Munoz, I)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Deadline to File Motion to Dismiss re #9 MOTION to DISMISS by Gregorio Sanchez. (Mahoney, Kevin)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/27/2019: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 is CONTINUED to 9/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by Advanced Industrial Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Advanced Industrial Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (FRCP Rule 12(b)(6))(Hering, Peter)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER #7 re Deadline to File Motion to Remand, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/24/2019. (Hall, S)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Deadline to File Motion to Remand re #1 Notice of Removal, by Gregorio Sanchez. (Mahoney, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Advanced Industrial Services, Inc.. (Hering, Peter)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Johanna Felix re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Hering, Peter)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Advanced Industrial Services, Inc.. (Hering, Peter)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Advanced Industrial Services, Inc. (Hering, Peter)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-19-100819 by Gregorio Sanchez. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8275167) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Hering, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Advanced Industrial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Industrial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Hering
Represented By: Maria Zoe Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Sanchez
Represented By: Kevin Mahoney
Represented By: Katherine J. Odenbreit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?