(DP) Cowan v. Davis
Petitioner: Robert Wesley Cowan
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00745
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference,signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/14/2019. ( Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alyssa Mack, GOVT on behalf of Robert Wesley Cowan. Attorney Mack, Alyssa added. (Mack, Alyssa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jennifer Marie Corey Mann on behalf of Robert Wesley Cowan. (Mann, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED EVENT (Gonzalez, R)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/5/19. (Gonzalez, R)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Appointment of Counsel; ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Application for Stay of Execution signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/29/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Robert Wesley Cowan. (Sant Agata, S)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Robert Wesley Cowan, CDC K-18501 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Death Penalty Case. (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Robert Wesley Cowan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Culshaw, Kelly)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel by Robert Wesley Cowan. Attorney Culshaw, Kelly L. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit State court order)(Culshaw, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (DP) Cowan v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Kenneth Norman Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Wesley Cowan
Represented By: Kelly L. Culshaw
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Corey Mann
Represented By: Alyssa Mack, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?