Dufresne, et al. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, et al.

Plaintiff: Estate of Sylvia Brown and Christopher Dufresne
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Wilmington Trust Company, Guaranty Holdings of California, Inc. and Quality Loan Service Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00777
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: MOTION HEARING held on 7/26/2019. The Court heard oral argument on defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank's Motion to Dismiss, document #3 , with an order to follow. Plaintiffs' Counsel Jason Estavillo telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel John Freed and Michael Warda telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Alice Timken. (Rooney, M)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Wilmington Trust Company to RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to DISMISS. (Freed, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER re Denying Motion to Dismiss re #3 MOTION to DISMISS, #10 Opposition to Motion by Christopher Dufresne, Estate of Sylvia Brown. (Estavillo, Jason)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Christopher Dufresne, Estate of Sylvia Brown to #4 Request for Judicial Notice. (Estavillo, Jason)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Christopher Dufresne, Estate of Sylvia Brown to #3 MOTION to DISMISS. (Estavillo, Jason)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER by Christopher Dufresne, Estate of Sylvia Brown.(Estavillo, Jason)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) As the Court has referred the Motion to Dismiss, document #3 , to the Magistrate Judge, said hearing, currently noticed for 7/16/2019 before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, will now be heard on 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Although personal appearance is encouraged, telephonic appearance is granted to any party wishing to do so, with each party directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/24/2019. (Rooney, M)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/19/2019. The hearing on the motion set for July 16, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before the undersigned is hereby vacated and a new hearing date will be set via minute order by the assigned magistrate judge if deemed appropriate.(Apodaca, P)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Guaranty Holdings of California, Inc..(Warda, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by Guaranty Holdings of California, Inc.. Attorney Warda, Michael S added.(Warda, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Wilmington Trust Company in re #3 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Freed, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to DISMISS by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Wilmington Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Freed, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Calaveras County Superior Court, case number 19CV44032 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, Wilmington Trust Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8292881) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freed, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dufresne, et al. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Represented By: John D. Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust Company
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Represented By: John D. Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranty Holdings of California, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Warda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Sylvia Brown
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Represented By: Caitlin M. Phair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dufresne
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Represented By: Caitlin M. Phair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?