Juarez v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Adolfo Juarez
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00801
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Service)(Rivera, Diana)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Rivera, Diana)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Forman, Stephanie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Forman, Stephanie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Forman, Stephanie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-18-102968 by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8301304) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Forman, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juarez v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adolfo Juarez
Represented By: Craig Evan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Represented By: Diana M. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?