Chevron Environmental Management Company et al v. Environmental Protection Corporation
Plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Chevron Environmental Management Company
Defendant: Environmental Protection Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00807
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/22/2019: In light of the entry of default (Doc. #16 ) as to defendant, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 is VACATED. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. #15 ) is denied as moot, and plaintiff SHALL file a noticed motion for default judgment, supported by evidence, no later than 8/21/2019. (Hall, S)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Environmental Protection Corporation.* (Hall, S)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of William A.I. McDonald, III in Support of Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Proposed Order Granting the Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment)(Vineyard, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/3/2019. Attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead added for Chevron Environmental Management Company and Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Hall, S)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8339952) (Attachments: #1 Notice Certificate of Good Standing)(Vineyard, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Environmental Protection Corporation served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Vineyard, Daniel)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney William A.I. McDonald for Chevron Environmental Management Company and Chevron U.S.A. Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/24/2019. (Hall, S)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney Christopher A. Thompson for Chevron Environmental Management Company and Chevron U.S.A. Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/24/2019. (Hall, S)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for attorney Christopher A. Thompson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8324939) (Attachments: #1 Notice Certificate of Good Standing)(Vineyard, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for attorney William A.I. "Trey" McDonald III to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8324794) (Attachments: #1 Notice Certificate of Good Standing)(Vineyard, Daniel)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Environmental Protection Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Ernest Vineyard* *1401 McKinney St.* *Suite 1900* *Houston, TX 77010*. (Sant Agata, S)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Vineyard, Daniel)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: Civil Cover Sheet. Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by acompleted civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If youneed assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Lundstrom, T)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 1:11-cv-01396-LJO-BAM by Chevron Environmental Management Company, a California corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., a Pennsylvania corporation. (Vineyard, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Chevron Environmental Management Company, a California corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., a Pennsylvania corporation. (Vineyard, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Chevron Environmental Management Company, a California corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., a Pennsylvania corporation. Attorney Vineyard, Daniel Ernest added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8301826) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vineyard, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevron Environmental Management Company et al v. Environmental Protection Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Ernest Vineyard
Represented By: Lindsey C. Moorhead, PHV
Represented By: Christopher A. Thompson, PHV
Represented By: William A.I. McDonald, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevron Environmental Management Company
Represented By: Daniel Ernest Vineyard
Represented By: Lindsey C. Moorhead, PHV
Represented By: Christopher A. Thompson, PHV
Represented By: William A.I. McDonald, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?