Evans et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Carla S Evans and Lewis D Evans
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00826
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Lewis D Evans, Carla S Evans. United States of America served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Leighton, Brian)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Brian C. Leighton* *755 N. Peach Ave.* *Suite G-10* *Clovis, CA 93611*. (Sant Agata, S)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES UNDER THE FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT - NEGLIGENCE (USDA/U.S. FOREST SERVICE) against United States of America by Lewis D Evans, Carla S Evans. Attorney Leighton, Brian C. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8310429) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Leighton, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla S Evans
Represented By: Brian C. Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis D Evans
Represented By: Brian C. Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?