(PC) Keck v. Batra
Plaintiff: Bill Keck
Defendant: S. Batra
Case Number: 1:2019cv00910
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Bill Keck. (Sant Agata, S)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/226/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
August 2, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Bill Keck. (Marrujo, C)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/2/19. (Marrujo, C)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Bill Keck. (Jessen, A)
July 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Bill Keck. (Jessen, A)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SUBMIT a Non-Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay the $400.00 Filing Fee Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Non-Prisoner IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
July 9, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Bill Keck. (Gonzalez, R)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Gonzalez, R)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against S. Batra by Bill Keck. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Keck v. Batra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Batra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?