(PC) Cato v. Denning et al
Plaintiff: James Cato, Jr.
Defendant: M. Denning and S. Hillman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00951
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Findings and Recommendations served on James Cato Jr. (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Certain Claims and Defendants be Dismissed re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/4/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PROCEED ON COGNIZABLE CLAIM(S) by James Cato, Jr. (Jessen, A)
August 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Screening Order served on James Cato Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER screening Plaintiff's complaint and granting Plaintiff leave to file either a First Amended Complaint or Notice of intent to proceed on claim found to be cognizable #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form) 30-Day Filing Deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
August 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on James Cato Jr.. (Sant Agata, S)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00951-LJO-SAB(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by James Cato, Jr. (Sant Agata, S)
July 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on James Cato Jr. (Jessen, A)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by James Cato, Jr. (Jessen, A)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for James Cato, Jr, CDC H-35663 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Gonzalez, R)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on SATF. (Gonzalez, R)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/11/2019*; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Cato, Jr. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against M. Denning, S. Hillman by James Cato, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Cato v. Denning et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cato, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?