Ali v. Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lilia Ali
Defendant: Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00959
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties in this case have contacted the Court for a date & time re a TELEPHONIC INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE CONFERENCE and the parties have agreed to the following: Friday, September 13, 2019, at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A two-page synopsis ONLY, either in memo or letter format, shall be filed by each party no later than 09:00 AM on September 11, 2019, outlining their respective positions, including summarizing the facts and relevant legal arguments. NO attachments or exhibits, two pages ONLY. The parties may appear at the conference by telephone with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/5/2019. (Valdez, E)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has reviewed preliminarily the papers filed in connection with the pending motion to remand #7 and finds the matter suitable for decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the hearing on that motion, currently set for 9/9/19, is VACATED. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of the Court's extraordinarily heavy caseload. The parties are warned that civil motions and trials set before district judges in this district are likely to experience significant delays due to judicial resource shortages. All parties are encouraged to reconsider magistrate judge consent signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 4, 2019. (Munoz, I)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY by Lilia Ali to RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to REMAND . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Nourmand in support of Reply, #2 Proof of Service)(Barnes, Kevin)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Defendant filed a Motion for Protective Order on August 28, 2019, which is scheduled for hearing on September 27, 2019 (Doc. #10 ). Judge McAuliffe encourages the parties to resolve these matters informally through this Court's informal discovery resolution process. The Court routinely employs an informal discovery resolution process whereby the Court will rule on a discovery dispute via a telephonic conference, provided the parties stipulate to an informal resolution. If the parties are unwilling to stipulate to an informal ruling for this particular motion, the Court will still require that the conference take place to offer guidance on the matter. The Court is available for a telephonic conference on Monday, September 9, 2019, at 09:30 AM or 10:00 AM; Wednesday September 11, 2019, at 10:00 AM; or Friday, September 13, 2019 at 09:00 AM, 09:30 AM, or 10:00 AM. No later than Wednesday September 4, 2019, at 12:00 PM, the parties shall meet and confer and advise Courtroom Deputy Esther Valdez at 559-499-5788 if they are amenable to an informal discovery dispute resolution, as well as provide a date that is convenient to hold the conference. Regardless of whether the Court will issue an informal ruling on the motion, two court days before the conference, each party should submit a two-page statement briefly outlining their respective positions, including summarizing the facts and relevant legal arguments. The parties may appear at the conference by telephone with each party using the following dial-in number and access code: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; access code 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/30/2019. (Valdez, E)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The Motion for Protective Order filed on August 28, 2019, by Defendant Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc. (Doc. #10 ) WILL BE HEARD on September 27, 2019, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The hearing set before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill is VACATED. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/2019. (Valdez, E)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Raimondo, Anthony)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc. to #7 MOTION to REMAND . (Attachments: #1 Notice REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ISO OPPOSITION TO MOTION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF STEVEN R. WAINESS ISO OPPOSITION TO MOTION, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF ANTHONY P. RAIMONDO ISO OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION, #4 OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE ISO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND)(Raimondo, Anthony)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Thursday, October 10, 2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/20/2019. (Valdez, E)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to REMAND by Lilia Ali. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to State Court, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael Nourmand in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to State Court)(Nourmand, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Nourmand on behalf of Lilia Ali. (Nourmand, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Nourmand on behalf of Lilia Ali. (Nourmand, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.. (Raimondo, Anthony)
July 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Civil New Case Documents for LJO, #3 Clerk's Notice served on James A. De Sario NACED, Michael Nourmand NACED. (Lundstrom, T)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE directing attorneys, James A. De Sario, NACED and Michael Nourmand, NACED to submit Petition to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Lundstrom, T)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number PCU-265134 by Lilia Ali. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8355224) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certification of Interested Entities or persons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Rights- (442) employment, #3 Declaration Lee Cohen, #4 Declaration Steven R. Wainess)(Raimondo, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Setton Pistachio of Terra Bella, Inc.
Represented By: Gerardo Hernandez, Jr.
Represented By: Steven R. Wainess
Represented By: Anthony Peter Raimondo
Represented By: James Daniel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilia Ali
Represented By: James A. De Sario, NACED
Represented By: Michael Nourmand, NACED
Represented By: Kevin T. Barnes
Represented By: Michael Nourmand
Represented By: James A. De Sario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?