(HC) Rodriguez v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Adrian Rodriguez
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 1:2019cv00965
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the habeas corpus petition be summarily dismissed with prejudice re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ; referred to Judge Ishii; New Case No. is 1:19-cv-00965 AWI-SKO (PC),signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/13/2019. Objections to F&R due 30-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00965 AWI-SKO (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
August 13, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), 4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Adrian Rodriguez. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/19/2019. (Marrujo, C)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Adrian Rodriguez signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/17/19. (Marrujo, C)
July 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Adrian Rodriguez. (Marrujo, C)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Adrian Rodriguez.(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Rodriguez v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adrian Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?