(SS) Ryan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lou Ryan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00973
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Rebecca Lou Ryan. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/29/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Branick-Abilla, Margaret added. (Branick-Abilla, Margaret)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rebecca Lou Ryan. (Lott, Shellie)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Rebecca Lou Ryan pursuant to order of the court. (Lott, Shellie)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Shellie Lott* *Cerney Kreuze & Lott, LLP* *42 N. Sutter Street, Suite 400* *Stockton, CA 95202*. (Lundstrom, T)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions) (Lundstrom, T)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rebecca Lou Ryan. (Lott, Shellie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Rebecca Lou Ryan. Attorney Lott, Shellie added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lott, Shellie)
July 16, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Ryan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lou Ryan
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?