(PC) Bowlson v. Bureau of Prisons
Plaintiff: Arthur Bowlson
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2019cv00974
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to USP Pollock, P.O. Box 2099, Polluck, LA 71467 by Arthur Bowlson. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Arthur Bowlson. (Jessen, A)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00974-DAD-EPG (PC). (Jessen, A)
August 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Minute Order served on Arthur Bowlson. (Rooney, M)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Clerk's Office is directed to randomly assign a Fresno District Judge to this matter. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/7/2019. (Rooney, M)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Arthur Bowlson. (Jessen, A)
July 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Arthur Bowlson. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to submit Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay filing fee within 45-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
July 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Arthur Bowlson. (Jessen, A)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12032.
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (DWor) [Transferred from mied on 7/16/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Mediation Program (LGra) [Transferred from mied on 7/16/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Arthur Bowlson against Bureau of Prisons (LGra) [Transferred from mied on 7/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bowlson v. Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Bowlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?