Amazon Logistics, Inc. v. Mann Bros. Transport Inc.
Plaintiff: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Mann Bros. Transport Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01060
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
2 Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER by Amazon Logistics, Inc..(Capuzzi, Kevin)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Amazon Logistics, Inc. by Mann Bros. Transport Inc.. Attorney Gill, Harry B. added. by Mann Bros. Transport Inc.. Attorney Gill, Harry B. added.(Gill, Harry)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mann Bros. Transport Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Miller, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Kevin M. Capuzzi's Pro Hac Vice Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/6/19. (Marrujo, C)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amazon Logistics, Inc. for attorney Kevin M. Capuzzi to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8392660) (Miller, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the Order of Recusal and Reassignment, the Scheduling Conference will now be heard on 11/19/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Report is due one week before the conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/6/2019. (Hernandez, M)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/02/2019. New Case Number: 1:19-cv-1060 DAD-SAB. (Flores, E)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mann Bros. Transport Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jennifer Ann Miller* *Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan and Aronoff LLP* *One Montgomery Tower, Suite 2700* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Flores, E)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Amazon Logistics, Inc.. (Miller, Jennifer)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mann Bros. Transport Inc. by Amazon Logistics, Inc.. Attorney Miller, Jennifer Ann added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8383578) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Pending Lien Sale, #2 Exhibit B- Redemption Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon Logistics, Inc. v. Mann Bros. Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Miller
Represented By: Kevin M. Capuzzi, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mann Bros. Transport Inc.
Represented By: Harry B. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?