(PC) Roland T. Koch v. Price
Plaintiff: Roland Thomas Koch
Defendant: Brandon Price
Case Number: 1:2019cv01082
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Roland Thomas Koch. (Lundstrom, T)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Roland Thomas Koch. (Lundstrom, T)
August 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 complaint, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Roland Thomas Koch. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Roland Thomas Koch. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Brandon Price by Roland Thomas Koch.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Roland T. Koch v. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Thomas Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?