(PC) Frederick Rogers v. Sherman
Plaintiff: Frederick Rogers
Defendant: Stuart Sherman
Case Number: 1:2019cv01124
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order to Show Cause served on Frederick Rogers. (Sant Agata, S)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order; Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/7/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 30, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Second Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Frederick Rogers. (Jessen, A)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/30/2019. Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
August 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings served on Frederick Rogers. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee within 21 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/21/2019. ( Motion for IFP due 21-Day Deadline) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Frederick Rogers. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Frederick Rogers (Martin-Gill, S)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS :Same as Current Address Listed by Frederick Rogers. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Stuart Sherman by Frederick Rogers.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Frederick Rogers v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?