(PC) Wilson v. Tuolumne County, et al.
Plaintiff: Christopher John Wilson
Defendant: Lane Durham, Sonora Police Department, Tyler Jay Sherman, Curtis Hankins, Tuolumne County Jail, Tuolumne County, Amanda Kaitlyn Gassett and City of Sonora
Case Number: 1:2019cv01132
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Notify Court by Christopher John Wilson. (Orozco, A)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Christopher John Wilson. Address remains the same. (Orozco, A)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Christopher John Wilson. (Orozco, A)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS (Current) by Christopher John Wilson. (Lundstrom, T)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Christopher John Wilson. (Lundstrom, T)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/16/2019. Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 10/21/2019. (Flores, E)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Docket Sheet; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Mail Plaintiff a Copy of Docket Sheet and Re-Serve Order Re: Consent signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/13/2019. (Flores, E)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment, #7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief served on Christopher John Wilson. (Flores, E)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION/Request for Docket Sheet by Christopher John Wilson. (Sant Agata, S)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Tuolumne County Jail, 175 Yaney Ave., Sonora, CA 95370 by Christopher John Wilson. Address previously updated. (Jessen, A)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP and directing payment of inmate filing fee by Tuolumne County Jail signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Christopher John Wilson. (Lundstrom, T)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Christopher John Wilson. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Christopher John Wilson. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against City of Sonora, Lane Durham, Amanda Kaitlyn Gassett, Curtis Hankins, Tyler Jay Sherman, Sonora Police Department, Tuolumne County and Tuolumne County Jail by Christopher John Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Wilson v. Tuolumne County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonora Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Jay Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuolumne County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuolumne County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Kaitlyn Gassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sonora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?