(SS) Simmons. Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Joseph Simmons. Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01162
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by John Joseph Simmons. Jr.. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Joseph Simmons. Jr.. (Kuntz, William)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Chen, Carolyn B. added. (Chen, Carolyn)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *William M. Kuntz* *Law Offices of William M. Kuntz* *4780 Arlington Ave.* *Riverside, CA 92504*. (Flores, E)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by John Joseph Simmons. Jr. (Kuntz, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Joseph Simmons. Jr.. (Kuntz, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by John Joseph Simmons. Jr.. Attorney Kuntz, William M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8423598) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Simmons. Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Carolyn B. Chen, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Simmons. Jr.
Represented By: William M. Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?