(PC) Thomas v. Chenalo et al
Plaintiff: Albert Eugene Thomas
Defendant: Florez, Medina, Salas, Guerrera, Padilla and Captain Chenalo
Case Number: 1:2019cv01185
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Albert Eugene Thomas. (Flores, E)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Albert Eugene Thomas, CDC E-88239 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Flores, E)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Flores, E)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01555.
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Albert Eugene Thomas. (Flores, E)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case transferred to the Eastern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *Eastern District of California*.*501 I Street, Room 4-200**Sacramento, CA 95814-7300*. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Albert Eugene Thomas. (jms) [Transferred from casd on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against #1, Chenalo, Florez, Guerrera, Medina, Padilla, Salas, filed by Albert Eugene Thomas)($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1555-BAS-LL. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms) [Transferred from casd on 8/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Thomas v. Chenalo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guerrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Chenalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Eugene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?