Schindler et al v. Merced City School District, et al
Plaintiff: Duwayne C. and Regina Schindler
Defendant: Brian Meisenheimer, Oliva Zarate, Veronica Villa, Ken Cooper, Doug Collins and Merced City School District
Case Number: 1:2019cv01188
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by All Defendants. Attorney Reyes, Ashley N. added. (Reyes, Ashley)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for Tuesday, December 3, 2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/3/2019. (Valdez, E)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Oliva Zarate (Haynes, Derek)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Derek Haynes: Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Sant Agata, S)
August 29, 2019 RECEIPT number 0972-8433931 for $400.00 fbo Olivia Zarate from Derek Joseph Haynes. (Jessen, A)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Notice to Adverse Party by OLIVIA ZARATE re #1 Notice of Removal. (Haynes, Derek)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Merced County Superior Court, case number 18CV-02595 by OLIVIA ZARATE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barakah M. Amaral)(Haynes, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schindler et al v. Merced City School District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duwayne C.
Represented By: Micha Star Liberty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Schindler
Represented By: Micha Star Liberty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Meisenheimer
Represented By: James D. Weakley
Represented By: Michelle E Sassano
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliva Zarate
Represented By: Derek Joseph Haynes
Represented By: Barakah M. Amaral
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Villa
Represented By: James D. Weakley
Represented By: Michelle E Sassano
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cooper
Represented By: James D. Weakley
Represented By: Michelle E Sassano
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Collins
Represented By: James D. Weakley
Represented By: Michelle E Sassano
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merced City School District
Represented By: James D. Weakley
Represented By: Michelle E Sassano
Represented By: Ashley N. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?