(PC) Thomas v. Reyna et al
Plaintiff: Robert Quincy Thomas
Defendant: L. Reyna, P. Vellido, J. Centeno, N. Huerta and M. Podsakoff
Case Number: 1:2019cv01217
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Robert Quincy Thomas. (Sant Agata, S)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RESCINDING #8 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/10/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Robert Quincy Thomas. (Sant Agata, S)
September 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order to Show Cause served on Robert Quincy Thomas. (Gonzalez, R)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***RESCINDED PER #11 ORDER***ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this Case Should Not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/26/19. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Robert Quincy Thomas. (Gonzalez, R)
September 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Robert Quincy Thomas. (Gonzalez, R)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP) (Gonzalez, R)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT as to Robert Quincy Thomas. (Gonzalez, R)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Robert Quincy Thomas, CDC D-26109 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcoran State Prison. (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/4/2019*; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Robert Quincy Thomas. (Jessen, A)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Centeno, N. Huerta, M. Podsakoff, L. Reyna, P. Vellido by Robert Quincy Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Thomas v. Reyna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Vellido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Centeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Huerta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Podsakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Quincy Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?